NM HB65 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - [LD 47] h and then to cncrd SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 53.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Autocycle definitions & requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Autocycle definitions & requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-25House[LD 47] h and then to cncrd SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 53.
2015-03-26Senate[LD 48] Passed Senate (39-0)
2015-03-17Senate[LD 41] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2015-03-02Senate[LD 30] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2015-03-02Senate[LD 30] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-02-09Senate[LD 15] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation
2015-02-09Senate[LD 15] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary
2015-02-09House[LD 15] Passed House (53-0)
2015-02-05House[LD 13] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
2015-02-05House[LD 13] Do not pass committee report adopted
2015-01-22House[LD 3] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works
2015-01-20House[LD 1] House Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback