NM HB643 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 146 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 146 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer Oversight Of Veterans' Home
Title
Transfer Oversight Of Veterans' Home
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Armstrong [D] | Rep. Harry Garcia [D] | Rep. Rodolpho Martinez [D] | Rep. William Pratt [D] |
Rep. Debra Sarinana [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 146 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:35 N:0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2019-03-10 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:0 |
2019-03-09 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-14 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |