NM HB64 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Native american veterans division
Title
Native american veterans division
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Finance |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Assigned to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs and then to Senate Finance |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (65-1) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2014-02-03 | House | [LD 10] Assigned to HHGIC |
2014-02-03 | House | [LD 10] Printed |
2014-02-03 | House | [LD 10] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2014-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Not Printed |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |