NM HB64 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - [LD 24] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - [LD 24] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Educational retirement changes
Title
Educational retirement changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-27 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-03-04 | House | [LD 35] Passed House (50-17) |
2013-02-27 | House | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-05 | House | [LD 16] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-02-05 | House | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Education |
2013-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Labor & Human Resources |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Labor & Human Resources and then to House Education and then to House Appropriations & Finance |