NM HB63 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - [LD 10] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - [LD 10] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' Comp Benefits & Intoxication
Title
Workers' Comp Benefits & Intoxication
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Roch [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Passed House (55-6) |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-21 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-01-21 | House | [LD 3] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Business & Employment |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Assigned to House Business & Employment and then to House Judiciary |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |