NM HB60 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SJC
Pending: Senate Taxation, Business and Transportation Committee
Hearing: Mar 9 in Room zoom
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motor Vehicle Sale Locations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Sale Locations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateSent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SJC
2021-02-26HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:52 N:15
2021-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Floor Amendment
2021-02-23HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-01-28HouseHCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2021-01-19HouseSent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HJC
2021-01-19HouseSent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback