NM HB564 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Probation & Parole Procedures

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Probation & Parole Procedures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseVetoed by Governor
2019-03-13HouseHouse has concurred with Senate Amendments
2019-03-12SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:26 N:6
2019-03-10SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-07SenateSJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-02-26SenateSent to SJC - Referrals: SJC/SFC
2019-02-24HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:51 N:16
2019-02-21HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-02-13HouseSent to HJC - Referrals: HJC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback