NM HB56 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC/SFC
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC/SFC
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sex Offender & Human Trafficking Changes
Title
Sex Offender & Human Trafficking Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC/SFC |
2021-02-22 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:3 |
2021-02-16 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-11 | House | Sent to HJC |
2021-02-11 | House | House Appropriations and Finance Committee referral withdrawn |
2021-01-28 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HJC/HAFC |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |