NM HB56 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Three Strikes Law
Title
Three Strikes Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Passed House (47-15) |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Floor amendment adopted |
2016-01-21 | House | [LD 3] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Assigned to House Regulatory & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |