NM HB546 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 197 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Fluid Oil & Gas Waste Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fluid Oil & Gas Waste Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 197 - Apr. 3
2019-03-15HouseSenate Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseHouse Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseSent to CC
2019-03-14HouseSenate failed to recede from its amendments
2019-03-14HouseHouse has failed to concur in Senate Amendments on a House Bill
2019-03-13SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:32 N:6
2019-03-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment
2019-03-13SenateSJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-03-10SenateSent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
2019-03-08HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:0
2019-03-08HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2019-02-25HouseHENRC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but without recommendation on Committee Substitution
2019-02-13HouseSent to HENRC - Referrals: HENRC/HJC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback