NM HB54 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-14 - STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-14 - STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Barber & Cosmetologist Duties
Title
Barber & Cosmetologist Duties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-14 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SJC |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:48 N:15 |
2021-02-09 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-28 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HSEIC |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |