NM HB54 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SJC
Pending: Senate Taxation, Business and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Barber & Cosmetologist Duties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Barber & Cosmetologist Duties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17SenateSent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SJC
2021-02-16HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:48 N:15
2021-02-09HouseHSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-01-28HouseHCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-01-19HouseSent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HSEIC
2021-01-19HouseSent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback