NM HB527 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 18 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] h and then to cncrd
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare - Medical Marijuana Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House of Representatives - House Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-29House[LD 13] h and then to cncrd
2017-02-18Senate[LD 33] Passed Senate (28-9)
2017-02-17Senate[LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-02-16Senate[LD 31] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2017-02-16Senate[LD 31] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2017-02-11Senate[LD 26] Referred to Senate Public Affairs
2017-02-11Senate[LD 26] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary
2017-01-28House[LD 12] Passed House (45-16)
2017-01-28House[LD 12] Floor amendment adopted
2017-01-26House[LD 10] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-26House[LD 10] Do not pass committee report adopted
2017-01-22House[LD 6] HHouse Health
2017-01-22House[LD 6] Assigned to HHouse Health
2017-01-22House[LD 6] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2017-01-22House[LD 6] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business
2017-01-22House[LD 6] Not Printed

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback