NM HB513 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disposition of certain public property
Title
Disposition of certain public property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |
2015-02-25 | House | [LD 27] Passed House (64-0) |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-09 | House | [LD 15] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |