NM HB51 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 12 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Passed Senate (41-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 6) Ch. 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 12 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Passed Senate (41-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 6) Ch. 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Right to farm nuisance changes
Title
Right to farm nuisance changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (41-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 6) Ch. 22. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (67-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-31 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-01-31 | House | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Agriculture & Water Resources |
2014-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Agriculture & Water Resources and then to House Judiciary |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |