NM HB507 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mobility Industry Market Task Force
Title
Mobility Industry Market Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-14 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC |
2019-03-06 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:53 N:0 |
2019-03-05 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-18 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-06 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HAFC |