NM HB491 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Failed to Pass in the Senate, Bill Has Died
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Immobilizing Or Towing Of Certain Vehicles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Immobilizing Or Towing Of Certain Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-16SenateFailed to Pass in the Senate, Bill Has Died
2019-03-14SenateSJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-08SenateSent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
2019-03-07HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:49 N:21
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Floor Amendment
2019-03-05HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-02-20HouseHCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-05HouseSent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HJC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback