NM HB486 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement background checks
Title
Law enforcement background checks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] Passed House (63-0) |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-25 | House | [LD 27] HSCAC |
2015-02-25 | House | [LD 27] Committee substitute and then to Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-25 | House | [LD 27] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-05 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-05 | House | [LD 13] Assigned to House Judiciary and then to HSCAC |