NM HB483 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.195.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.195.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Public defender commission
Title
Public defender commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 42 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 42 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.195. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (34-8) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Floor amendment adopted |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-03-07 | Senate | [LD 38] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (42-27) |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-27 | House | [LD 32] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-02-27 | House | [LD 32] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-27 | House | [LD 32] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-07 | House | [LD 18] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-02-07 | House | [LD 18] Assigned to House Judiciary and then to House Appropriations & Finance |