NM HB466 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-15 - Failed to Pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-15 - Failed to Pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Malnutrition Commission
Title
Malnutrition Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Armstrong [D] | Rep. Karen Bash [D] | Rep. Joanne Ferrary [D] | Rep. William Pratt [D] |
Rep. Christine Trujillo [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Senate | Failed to Pass in Senate |
2019-03-13 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-10 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC |
2019-03-09 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:57 N:0 |
2019-03-07 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-28 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-04 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HSEIC |