NM HB445 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - [LD 39] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - [LD 39] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reduce renewable portfolio standards
Title
Reduce renewable portfolio standards
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Scott [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-09 | House | [LD 35] Passed House (33-32) |
2015-02-27 | House | [LD 29] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-20 | House | [LD 24] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2015-02-20 | House | [LD 24] Committee substitute and then to WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2015-02-20 | House | [LD 24] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] HEENC |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] HEENC and then to HRPAC |