NM HB440 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 110 - Mar. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 110 - Mar. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Solar Energy Improvement Assessments
Title
Solar Energy Improvement Assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-16 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 110 - Mar. 28 |
2019-03-16 | House | House has concurred with Senate Amendments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:31 N:8 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2019-03-14 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-03-10 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SCONC |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:35 N:28 |
2019-02-28 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2019-02-25 | House | HENRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-14 | House | HLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-31 | House | Sent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC/HENRC |