NM HB436 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Retiree health care contribution rates
Title
Retiree health care contribution rates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (65-0) |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] HWMC |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-02 | House | [LD 10] HHC |
2015-02-02 | House | [LD 10] HHC and then to HWMC |