NM HB428 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Passed Senate (36-5) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Passed Senate (36-5) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
County officer salaries
Title
County officer salaries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | [LD 51] Passed Senate (36-5) Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | [LD 51] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-26 | Senate | [LD 48] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (64-0) |
2015-03-19 | House | [LD 43] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-02 | House | [LD 10] HGEIC |
2015-02-02 | House | [LD 10] HGEIC and then to House Judiciary |