NM HB424 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Water districts tort immunity
Title
Water districts tort immunity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (56-0) |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-25 | House | [LD 27] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | House | [LD 27] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-02 | House | [LD 10] HSCAC |
2015-02-02 | House | [LD 10] HSCAC and then to House Judiciary |