NM HB421 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Indoor Tanning Act
Title
Indoor Tanning Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-14 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC |
2019-03-11 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:30 N:26 |
2019-03-06 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-20 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-31 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HJC |