NM HB42 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 58 - Mar. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Pharmaceutical Service Reimbursement Parity

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmaceutical Service Reimbursement Parity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 58 - Mar. 6
2020-02-20SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0
2020-02-18SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-02-14SenateSPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-02-10SenateSent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SFC
2020-02-08HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:40 N:21
2020-02-08Housemultiple floor amendments
2020-02-04HouseHSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-01-28HouseHHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-01-22HouseSent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HSEIC
2020-01-21HouseSent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback