NM HB411 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Pocket Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Local Gov't Tax Distribution Definitions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Gov't Tax Distribution Definitions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-16HousePocket Veto
2019-03-16SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0
2019-03-14SenateWithdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2019-02-28SenateSCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-19SenateSent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SFC
2019-02-18HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:0
2019-02-11HouseHTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-07HouseHLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-29HouseSent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC/HTRC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback