NM HB40 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
Pending: House Appropriations & Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
Pending: House Appropriations & Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Private Detention Facility Moratorium Act
Title
Private Detention Facility Moratorium Act
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Bash [D] | Rep. Gail Chasey [D] | Sen. Katy Duhigg [D] | Rep. Daymon Ely [D] |
Sen. Gerald Ortiz Y Pino [D] | Rep. Angelica Rubio [D] | Rep. Linda Serrato [D] | Sen. Bill Tallman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to: HJC/HAFC |
2021-02-02 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HJC |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=40&year=21 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/21%20Regular/bills/house/HB0040.pdf |