NM HB40 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] DP - PASSED/S (33-0) SGND (Apr. 5) Ch. 65.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] DP - PASSED/S (33-0) SGND (Apr. 5) Ch. 65.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Abandoned mine reclamation act jurisdiction
Title
Abandoned mine reclamation act jurisdiction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP - PASSED/S (33-0) SGND (Apr. 5) Ch. 65. | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP-SJC | |
2011-02-11 | [LD 25] SCONC/SJC-SCONC | |
2011-02-17 | [LD 31] PASSED/H (58-8) | |
2011-02-14 | [LD 28] DP | |
2011-01-30 | [LD 13] DP-HJC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] HENRC/HJC-HENRC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] HPREF |