NM HB379 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Film production tax credit increase

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Film production tax credit increase

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-16House[LD 52] Vetoed by the Governor and date.
2013-03-08House[LD 39] h and then to cncrd
2013-03-11Senate[LD 40] Passed Senate (32-8)
2013-03-07Senate[LD 38] Do pass committee report adopted
2013-02-15Senate[LD 24] Referred to Senate Finance
2013-02-15Senate[LD 24] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2013-02-12Senate[LD 21] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation
2013-02-12Senate[LD 21] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance
2013-02-22House[LD 29] Passed House (64-0)
2013-02-19House[LD 26] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
2013-02-19House[LD 26] Do not pass committee report adopted
2013-01-30House[LD 12] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback