NM HB377 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-05 - [LD 18] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-05 - [LD 18] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare
Title
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | Senate | [LD 18] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-05 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Finance |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Passed House (68-0) |
2016-01-31 | House | [LD 13] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-31 | House | [LD 13] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Referred to House Ways & Means |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Assigned to House Ways & Means |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Not Printed |