NM HB374 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] Signed by one or both houses (Mar.15) Ch. 20.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] Signed by one or both houses (Mar.15) Ch. 20.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Safe haven for infants site definition
Title
Safe haven for infants site definition
Sponsors
Rep. Emily Kane [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 55] Signed by one or both houses (Mar.15) Ch. 20. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-03-04 | House | [LD 35] Passed House (64-0) |
2013-03-01 | House | [LD 34] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-30 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Judiciary |