NM HB370 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 203 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 203 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal Record Expungement Act
Title
Criminal Record Expungement Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 203 - Apr. 3 |
2019-03-14 | House | House has concurred with Senate Amendments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:28 N:13 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2019-03-07 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:52 N:17 |
2019-02-26 | House | multiple floor amendments |
2019-02-24 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-13 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-25 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HJC |