NM HB37 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 208 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 208 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
No Leda Funds For Water Rights Purchases
Title
No Leda Funds For Water Rights Purchases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 208 - Apr. 3 |
2019-03-13 | House | House has concurred with Senate Amendments |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:34 N:0 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-07 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SCORC |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:3 |
2019-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2019-02-19 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-29 | House | HAWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-16 | House | Sent to HAWC - Referrals: HAWC/HCEDC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |