NM HB37 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (37-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.45.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (37-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.45.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Military discount for hunting licenses
Title
Military discount for hunting licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] PASSED/S (37-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.45. | |
2010-02-10 | [LD 17] DP | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] SCONC | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] PASSED/H (55-0) | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DP | |
2010-02-10 | [LD 17] DP-HAFC | |
2010-01-25 | [LD 5] w/drn - prntd- ref HCPAC/HAFC-HCPAC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] not prntd-HRC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] HPREF |