NM HB36 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-05 - [LD 18] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-05 - [LD 18] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Time Limit For Prosecuting Certain Crimes
Title
Time Limit For Prosecuting Certain Crimes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | Senate | [LD 18] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-05 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Passed House (69-0) |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Floor amendment adopted |
2016-01-31 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Safety & Civil Affairs |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Assigned to House Safety & Civil Affairs and then to House Judiciary |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Assigned to |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Printed |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |