NM HB36 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-12 - [LD 26] SPAC/SFC-SPAC API.
Pending: Senate Public Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-12 - [LD 26] SPAC/SFC-SPAC API.
Pending: Senate Public Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Social services database contracts
Title
Social services database contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] SPAC/SFC-SPAC API. | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] DP/a- PASSED/H (33-31) | |
2011-01-28 | [LD 11] DP-HHGAC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] HCPAC/HHGAC-HCPAC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] HPREF |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=36&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/house/HB0036.pdf |