NM HB356 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Cannabis Regulation Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis Regulation Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-09SenateAction Postponed Indefinitely
2019-03-09SenateSPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-03-08SenateSent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SFC
2019-03-07HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:36 N:34
2019-03-07HouseFloor substitute adopted
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Floor Amendment
2019-03-06HouseWithdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2019-03-05HouseWithdrawn from committee and tabled
2019-02-24HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2019-02-11HouseHHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-24HouseSent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HJC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback