NM HB343 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Notice & Fees Of Mechanics' Liens
Title
Notice & Fees Of Mechanics' Liens
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2019-03-04 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:59 N:0 |
2019-03-01 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to: HCEDC |
2019-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-02-12 | House | HLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-24 | House | Sent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC/HJC |