NM HB341 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - [LD 48] Passed Senate (39-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 1) Ch. 16.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - [LD 48] Passed Senate (39-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 1) Ch. 16.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children, youth & families worker loans
Title
Children, youth & families worker loans
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmie Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | [LD 48] Passed Senate (39-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 1) Ch. 16. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Assigned to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |
2015-02-26 | House | [LD 28] Passed House (63-0) |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-09 | House | [LD 15] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2015-02-09 | House | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] HWMC |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] HWMC and then to House Appropriations & Finance |