NM HB335 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Passed Senate (34-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 8) Ch. 77.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Passed Senate (34-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 8) Ch. 77.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Liquor control tasting permit violations
Title
Liquor control tasting permit violations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Passed Senate (34-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 8) Ch. 77. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |
2015-02-20 | House | [LD 24] Passed House (57-0) |
2015-02-17 | House | [LD 21] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] Assigned to House Regulatory & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary |