NM HB332 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Passed Senate (39-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Passed Senate (39-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reduce probation time for good behavior
Title
Reduce probation time for good behavior
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | [LD 51] Passed Senate (39-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | House | [LD 27] Passed House (63-0) |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-04 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-04 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] Assigned to House Regulatory & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary |