NM HB330 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Training Law Enforcement For School Resources
Title
Training Law Enforcement For School Resources
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0 |
2019-03-03 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-04 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-24 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HJC |