NM HB33 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Livestock Board Meat Inspections
Title
Livestock Board Meat Inspections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC |
2021-03-03 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:69 N:0 |
2021-03-02 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-11 | House | HAWC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to: HAWC/HAFC |
2021-02-11 | House | HSEIC ref w/drn |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HAWC - Referrals: HAWC/HSEIC |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |