NM HB327 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-14 - Referred to: HRC
Pending: House Rules & Order of Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-14 - Referred to: HRC
Pending: House Rules & Order of Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare - Telecomm Carrier Regulatory Requirements
Title
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-14 | House | Referred to: HRC |
2021-03-14 | House | w/drn h/calendar |
2021-03-13 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-03-11 | House | Sent to HCEDC |
2021-03-11 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar, ordered printed and referred to |
2021-02-18 | House | Not Printed |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=327&year=21 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/21%20Regular/bills/house/HB0327.pdf |