NM HB326 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Tax Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-02-15SenateSCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-02-13SenateSent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SFC
2020-02-12HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:0
2020-02-08HouseHTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-01-31HouseSent to HTRC - Referrals: HTRC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback