NM HB319 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School transportation boundary agreements
Title
School transportation boundary agreements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Education |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (60-6) |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] Referred to House Education |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] HGEIC |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] HGEIC and then to House Education |