NM HB317 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alternate voting locations
Title
Alternate voting locations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Rules |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (52-4) |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-10 | House | [LD 16] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-10 | House | [LD 16] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | House | [LD 5] HGEIC |
2015-01-26 | House | [LD 5] HGEIC and then to House Judiciary |