NM HB31 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Phased-in Minimum Wage Increase

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Phased-in Minimum Wage Increase

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25SenateAction Postponed Indefinitely
2019-02-25SenateSPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-02-14SenateSent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SCORC
2019-02-13HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:44 N:26
2019-02-13HouseHouse of Representatives Floor Amendment
2019-02-04HouseHCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-23HouseHLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-16HouseSent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HCEDC
2019-01-15HouseSent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback